THE FRIENDS OF SAXONBURY HOUSE SURGERY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the CIO is to relieve sickness and to preserve the health of the patients of Saxonbury House Surgery by providing or assisting in the provision of equipment, facilities and services, not normally provided by the statutory authorities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- East Sussex
Governance
- 12 January 2024: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Martin James Smith | Trustee | 12 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lindsay Cole | Trustee | 12 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robin Streatfield | Trustee | 12 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Georgina Bullock | Trustee | 12 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anthony John Brierley Wayte | Trustee | 12 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Andrew West | Trustee | 12 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nigel John Bullock | Trustee | 12 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emer Mary Murphy | Trustee | 12 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Elizabeth West | Trustee | 12 January 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 12 Jan 2024 as amended on 12 Dec 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND TO PRESERVE THE HEALTH OF THE PATIENTS OF SAXONBURY HOUSE SURGERY BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EQUIPMENT, FACILITIES AND SERVICES NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
SAXONBURY HOUSE MEDICAL GROUP
SAXONBURY HOUSE
CROFT ROAD
CROWBOROUGH
TN6 1DL
- Phone:
- 01892603131
- Email:
- friendsofsaxonbury@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window