STONEHOUSE GANG

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
provide facilities and activities for children and young people aged 6-25.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £32,095 from 1 government grant(s)
People

17 Trustee(s)
42 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 27 October 1965: Standard registration
- 22 February 2024: Funds received from 265840 OLIVER '68
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PETER HARVEY | Trustee | 20 November 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
ELLIE FURNESS | Trustee | 20 November 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
KERRY BREWER | Trustee | 20 November 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
KAREN CLIFT | Trustee | 20 November 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
JOHN LINES | Trustee | 20 November 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
EMMON Khatmian | Trustee | 26 November 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
DANIEL KILBRIDE | Trustee | 26 November 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
NICHOLAS HALL | Trustee | 14 November 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
DEBORAH HARVEY | Trustee | 19 December 2017 |
|
|
||||||||
PAUL WHITE | Trustee | 21 May 2014 |
|
|
||||||||
LAURA REYNOLDS | Trustee | 30 July 2013 |
|
|
||||||||
Randal Brew | Trustee | 18 May 2010 |
|
|||||||||
PAUL PLATNAUER | Trustee | 22 May 2007 |
|
|
||||||||
MARK RUSHBROOKE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
Dr ANDREW HARDIE | Trustee |
|
||||||||||
MR KEN SHIPWAY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
MISS LINDA ROAN | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.17k | £367.14k | £132.99k | £136.99k | £240.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £145.59k | £112.17k | £130.81k | £150.02k | £153.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £9.91k | N/A | £32.10k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 12 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 February 2021 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11 MAY 1948 AS AMENDED 19 OCTOBER 1965, 31 OCTOBER 1990, 10 NOVEMBER 1993 AND 21 SEPTEMBER 2006.
Charitable objects
TO HELP AND EDUCATE BOYS AND GIRLS THROUGH THEIR LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 2 OF THE CONSTITUTION.)
Area of benefit
STONEHOUSE AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Stonehouse Gang
90-92 Burnel Road
BIRMINGHAM
B29 5SN
- Phone:
- 01214272961
- Email:
- info@stonehousegang.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window