COLYTON FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of children and young people in the South West of England who are identified as having high academic potential but face barriers in progressing their educational aspirations due to social or economic disadvantage.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cornwall
- Devon
- Dorset
- Somerset
Governance
- 01 February 2024: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Barry Sindall | Chair | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Professor Janice Kay CBE | Trustee | 25 March 2024 |
|
|||||
Camilla Chandler-Mant | Trustee | 12 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Johnson | Trustee | 29 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Neal Whitfield | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Harris | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £300 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 22 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 22 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 01 Feb 2024
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE SOUTH WEST OF ENGLAND WHO ARE IDENTIFIED AS HAVING HIGH ACADEMIC POTENTIAL BUT FACE BARRIERS IN PROGRESSING THEIR EDUCATIONAL ASPIRATIONS DUE TO SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC DISADVANTAGE, THIS IS ACHIEVED BY: A. PROVIDING ACADEMIC MENTORING AND SUPPORT TO SUPPLEMENT THEIR SCHOOLING; B. DELIVERING TRAINING TO TEACHERS AND SCHOOL LEADERS SO THAT THEY ARE BETTER EQUIPPED TO SUPPORT HIGH ACADEMIC POTENTIAL STUDENTS; AND C. ENGAGING WITH UNIVERSITIES TO ASSIST THEM IN PRODUCING THEIR ACCESS AND PARTICIPATION PLANS TO IMPROVE THE NUMBER OF STUDENTS FROM DISADVANTAGED BACKGROUNDS PROGRESSING TO HIGHER EDUCATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
COLYTON GRAMMAR SCHOOL
WHITWELL LANE
COLYFORD
EX24 6HN
- Phone:
- 01297552327
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window