VSS (VIRTUAL SOCCER SCHOOLS) LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
39 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Argentina
- Australia
- Belgium
- Bosnia And Herzegovina
- Brazil
- Cambodia
- Central African Republic
- Colombia
- Congo (Democratic Republic)
- Egypt
- France
- Ghana
- India
- Indonesia
- Ireland
- Kenya
- Lesotho
- Malawi
- Malaysia
- Namibia
- Nepal
- Nigeria
- Northern Ireland
- Peru
- Philippines
- Qatar
- Saudi Arabia
- Senegal
- Sierra Leone
- South Africa
- Tanzania
- Uganda
- United Arab Emirates
- United States
- Zambia
Governance
- 10 January 2024: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alan Manuel Greenberg | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Thomas Edward Lamb | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Timothy Michael Ream | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £37.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 10 AUG 2023 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 30 AUG 2023
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE RESTRICTED SPECIFICALLY, IN EACH CASE ONLY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE THE MENTAL AND PHYSICAL HEALTH OF YOUNG PEOPLE, INCLUDING WITHOUT LIMITING THE FOREGOING, BY EDUCATING YOUNG PEOPLE IN RELATION TO MENTAL AND PHYSICAL HEALTH THROUGH WORKING WITH PROFESSIONAL SPORTS PERSONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O BLINKHORNS
27 MORTIMER STREET
LONDON
W1T 3BL
- Phone:
- 07360206420
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window