THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF UPPER WHARFEDALE & LITTONDALE

Charity number: 1205821
Recently registered

Charity overview

This charity has been recently registered - it does not need to update its information until 10 months after its first financial period ends

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Anglican worship and missionary work within the parish and beyond.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • North Yorkshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 21 November 2023: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • UPPER WHARFEDALE & LITTONDALE PCC (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Tom Lusty Chair 28 June 2021
None on record
Anne Christine Vetch Trustee 27 November 2024
GRASSINGTON HUB
Received: On time
Ann Victoria Bliss Trustee 17 April 2024
None on record
Dr Ian Michael Smith Trustee 17 April 2024
None on record
Elizabeth Jayne Hird Trustee 17 April 2024
None on record
Nicholas Davies Trustee 15 May 2019
None on record
Joseph Andrew Hitchon Trustee 15 May 2019
None on record
HARRY KEITH JEDDERE-FISHER Trustee 15 May 2019
KUNDE FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Jacqueline Marie Yarrow Trustee 15 May 2019
HUBBERHOLME CHURCH POOR PASTURE
Received: On time
SARAH JEAN PAUL Trustee 15 May 2019
AMERDALE HALL
Received: On time
Rebecca Ward-Dooley Trustee 15 May 2019
None on record
Pauline Amelia Thompson Trustee 15 May 2019
None on record

Financial history

This charity was registered recently. It does not have to provide information until 10 months after its first financial period.

Accounts and annual returns

This is a newly registered charity - accounts and annual return not required yet. The charity does not need to update its information until 10 months after its first financial period ends.

Governing document

Contact information

Address:
ST. MARYS CHURCH
KETTLEWELL
SKIPTON
BD23 5RD
Phone:
01756380237