Accounts and annual returns ALLESLEY PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 522906
Charity reporting is up to date (263 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 August 2023 20 March 2025 263 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 August 2023 20 March 2025 263 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 August 2022 20 March 2025 629 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 August 2022 20 March 2025 629 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 August 2021 30 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 August 2021 30 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 02 September 2020 30 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 02 September 2020 30 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 02 September 2019 29 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 02 September 2019 29 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window