Financial history CANLEY COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 522909
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016
Total gross income £16.61k £1.68k £1.02k £2 £0
Total expenditure £18.34k £4.96k £423 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £0