ANGEL ADVOCATES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Angel Advocates can help in most situations involving individuals or groups and an authority (an authority is usually a public service provider, i.e., local council, NHS, schools and education, courts, or other government departments, care providers). You do not need to be entitled to an advocate under the law to access Angel Advocates.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
Total income includes £9,970 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 12 December 2023: CIO registration
- ANGELS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Hurrell | Chair | 06 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Park | Trustee | 16 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Philip Guest | Trustee | 20 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Jane Bastow | Trustee | 06 October 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £9.97k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 24 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 17 April 2025 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 12 Dec 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE UNITED KINGDOM, IN LINE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH; 4.1. TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF PEOPLE IN NEED BY THE PROVISION OF AN ADVOCACY SERVICE WITH THE AIM OF RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, OR OTHERWISE VULNERABLE, ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY AND/ OR IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; AND 4.2. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN PARTICULAR TRAINING IN ADVOCACY SKILLS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
DODD & CO
FIFTEEN
MONTGOMERY WAY
ROSEHILL INDUSTRIAL ESTATE
CARLISLE
CA1 2RW
- Phone:
- 07760987908
- Email:
- ceo@angeladvocates.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window