FOLESHILL COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Education, Advice, Recreation,
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Coventry City
Governance
- 25 November 1966: Standard registration
- 11 August 2015: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2011 | 05/04/2012 | 05/04/2013 | 05/04/2014 | 05/04/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £36.00k | £26.85k | £44.21k | £32.47k | £27.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £35.24k | £35.82k | £38.22k | £35.29k | £41.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2015 | 11 August 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2015 | 11 August 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 April 2014 | 24 November 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2014 | 24 November 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 April 2013 | 20 January 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2013 | 20 January 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 April 2012 | 04 March 2013 | 27 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2012 | 04 March 2013 | 27 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED SEPTEMBER 1957
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE WELL-BEING OF THE COMMUNITY RESIDENT IN THE BENEFICIAL AREA. TO CO-OPERATE WITH THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY IN THE MANAGEMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE.
Area of benefit
FOLESHILL DISTRICT AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window