Financial history HARBURY VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 522932
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £64.65k £176.02k £34.97k £47.57k £40.79k
Total expenditure £27.15k £32.99k £34.52k £34.16k £37.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £235 £180
Income from government grants £52.30k £16.34k £9.28k N/A N/A