Trustees HARBURY VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 522932

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Rutherford | Chair | 24 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Claire McGurk | Trustee | 11 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Andrew Gimson | Trustee | 23 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Friling | Trustee | 20 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Keane | Trustee | 26 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Bright | Trustee | 26 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jane Margaret Haggitt | Trustee | 16 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Gordon Douglas Robbins | Trustee | 16 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
JOHN CROSSLING | Trustee | 30 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
CELIA NEILL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KEITH THOMPSON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.