THE GLEBELANDS COMMUNITY CENTRE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Rent Space within the centre for local community groups to carry out their activities
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- West Sussex
Governance
- 14 November 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jacqueline Swindells | Chair | 03 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Edward Burgar | Trustee | 16 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lara Gretchen Sparks | Trustee | 03 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael Johnson Foster-Baptiste | Trustee | 30 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simon Patrick Ash | Trustee | 30 November 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 14 Nov 2023
Charitable objects
OBJECTIVES "TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF FERRTING AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD (HEREIN IN AFTERCALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT") WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE, OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR THE RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTIVES BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER: TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN OR MANGE OR COOPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE" NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE N APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH [SECTION 7 OF THE C CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND)ACT 2005] AND [SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008]
Contact information
- Address:
-
Glebelands Community Centre
Greystoke Road
Ferring
Worthing
West Sussex
BN12 5JL
- Phone:
- 07562295105
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.