KNIGHTCOTE VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Various Sporting Activities Social Meetings for the community
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 03 June 1966: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CYNTHIA BRONWEN BETTANY | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Sian Hyde | Trustee | 23 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Moira Dickson | Trustee | 21 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Louise Hibbert | Trustee | 20 November 2017 |
|
|||||
Leasal Chapple-Hyam | Trustee | 23 February 2009 |
|
|
||||
VERONICA COTTERILL | Trustee |
|
||||||
CAROL ANNE BARRETT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KATE THOMSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.93k | £12.01k | £17.81k | £692 | £4.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.32k | £2.47k | £1.90k | £2.42k | £2.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £17.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 11 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 14 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 23 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 09 December 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF TRUST DATED 7TH APRIL, 1966
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
KNIGHTCOTE
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE ELMS
KNIGHTCOTE
SOUTHAM
CV47 2SQ
- Phone:
- 01295770694
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window