Financial history LAPWORTH VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 522947
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £45.11k £18.10k £47.93k £42.64k £56.16k
Total expenditure £24.86k £17.80k £30.33k £35.45k £42.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k N/A N/A N/A £9.50k