NORTON JUXTA KEMPSEY C OF E PRIMARY SCHOOL PTFA

Charity Number: 1206956
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We raise money to enhance the school Journey for the children at Norton Juxta Kempsey C of E Primary School. Activities take place at the school, i.e Summer & Christmas Fayres, Film night, disco etc.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £14,424
Total expenditure: £10,384

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Services
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Worcestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 09 February 2024: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • NJK PTFA (Working name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Katie Baker Chair 06 November 2023
None on record
SARAH MARSHALL Trustee 10 November 2023
None on record
Michelle Claire Maitland Trustee 07 November 2023
None on record
Eleanor Jane Eeles Trustee 07 November 2023
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2024
Total gross income £14.42k
Total expenditure £10.38k
Income from government contracts N/A
Income from government grants N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 14 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
NORTON PRIMARY SCHOOL
WADBOROUGH ROAD
LITTLEWORTH
WORCESTER
WR5 2QJ
Phone:
01905820420
Website:

No information available