POTTERS GREEN COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The community association helps members of the community especially the young and aged. Its activities include a term time playgroup, weekly OAP's group, bingo, football teams, bowls teams, domino teams, table tennis, line dancing, brownies, Irish dancing and function room for weddings etc.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2022
Total income includes £483 from 2 government grant(s)
People

1 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Coventry City
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 20 March 1967: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PHILIP WILLIAMS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2018 | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £268.86k | £260.50k | £246.67k | £225.01k | £247.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £173.53k | £258.72k | £252.45k | £222.72k | £255.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £161.39k | £35.41k | £45.02k | £483 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 28 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 28 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 393 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 393 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 28 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 28 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 28 February 2023 | 304 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 28 February 2023 | 304 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 28 February 2023 | 669 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 28 February 2023 | 669 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTD 17 SEPTEMBER 1962 AS AMENDED 12 JUNE 1988 AND 14 SEPTEMBER 1988
Charitable objects
1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE 2) THE PROVISION OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE
Area of benefit
POTTERS GREEN ROAD AND WOODWAY LANE AND A SUFFICIENTLY WIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
19 Linwood Drive
Walsgrave
Coventry
CV2 2LZ
- Phone:
- 07905511237
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window