PTSD999
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve the needs, suffering and distress, primarily(but not exclusively), of serving and former personnel of the emergency services, HM Prison services and other such governmental and non governmental agencies and charities as the trustee think fit, who are suffering or at risk of suffering from mental trauma, PTSD, or other mental health conditions through the provision of a listening service
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 12 March 2024: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David John Elsom | Chair | 10 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Luke Russell | Trustee | 22 October 2024 |
|
|||||
Trevor John Hermes | Trustee | 22 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael John Cook | Trustee | 10 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Peak | Trustee | 12 March 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16 FEB 2017 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 10 JUL 2023 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 09 NOV 2023 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15 FEB 2024 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 29 FEB 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: A) TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS, SUFFERING AND DISTRESS OF SERVING AND FORMER PERSONNEL OF THE EMERGENCY SERVICES, HM PRISON SERVICE AND OF SUCH OTHER GOVERNMENTAL AND NON-GOVERNMENTAL AGENCIES, ORGANISATIONS AND CHARITIES AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT, WHO ARE SUFFERING OR AT RISK OF SUFFERING FROM MENTAL TRAUMA, POST TRAUMATIC STRESS, POST TRAUMATIC STRESS DISORDER OR OTHER MENTAL HEALTH CONDITIONS THROUGH THE PROVISION OF A LISTENING SERVICE, ADVICE AND INFORMATION AND SUCH OTHER SUPPORT AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE. B) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE CAUSES, DETECTION AND TREATMENT OF MENTAL TRAUMA, POST TRAUMATIC STRESS, POST TRAUMATIC STRESS DISORDER OR OTHER MENTAL HEALTH CONDITIONS SUFFERED BY THOSE WORKING OR HAVE WORKED, PRIMARILY (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY), FOR THE EMERGENCY SERVICES. IN THIS ARTICLE 1.1 “EMERGENCY SERVICES” MEANS THE FIRE, AMBULANCE, POLICE, COASTGUARD AND SEARCH AND RESCUE SERVICES AND ANY OTHER AGENCY OR ORGANISATION (INCLUDING GOVERNMENTAL OR CHARITABLE) THAT PROVIDES THE SAME OR SIMILAR SERVICES AS, OR PROVIDES SUPPORT TO, THE FIRE, AMBULANCE, POLICE, COASTGUARD AND SEARCH AND RESCUE SERVICES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
MAPUS SMITH & LEMMON LLP
30 OLD MARKET
WISBECH
PE13 1NB
- Phone:
- 07957252955
- Email:
- support@ptsd999.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.