RATLEY VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 522987
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

For the purposes of promoting the physical & mental recreation, & social, moral & intellectual development for the benefit of the inhabitants of the parish of Ratley.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £17,387
Total expenditure: £15,256

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Economic/community Development/employment
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Warwickshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 03 October 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Shona Walton Trustee 18 July 2017
None on record
SUSAN FLINTOFF Trustee
None on record
LISA CURTLIN Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £13.80k £27.51k £20.05k £10.91k £17.39k
Total expenditure £10.23k £5.12k £10.09k £13.46k £15.26k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £750 £24.67k £15.23k £2.43k £3.21k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 13 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 08 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 19 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 18 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 18 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 01 February 2021 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Ratley Village Hall
Chapel Lane
Ratley
Banbury
OX15 6DS
Phone:
01295670278
Email:
No information available
Website:

ratleyvillagehall.co.uk