SALFORD PRIORS MEMORIAL HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of community space in the form of Main Hall that can accommodate up to 100 people. Kitchen space and two further meeting rooms with computer access.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 18 November 1963: Standard registration
- VILLAGE HALL (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stuart Begley | Trustee | 04 May 2022 |
|
|||||
John Bradfield | Trustee | 27 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr Stephen Marsden Foster | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.22k | £22.62k | £18.16k | £14.86k | £19.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.92k | £17.00k | £10.87k | £24.36k | £18.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £19.67k | £8.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 25 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 June 2024 | 151 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 18TH SEPTEMBER 1951
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
PARISH OF SALFORD PRIORS AND ITS IMMEDIATE VICINITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 Moat Farm Cottages
Abbots Salford
EVESHAM
Worcestershire
WR11 8US
- Phone:
- 07887948944
- Email:
- memorialhallhire@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window