TOWNSEND HALL

Charity number: 522997
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Townsend Hall is a community hall in the centre of Shipston on Stour, a market town in South Warwickshire, close to the borders with Oxfordshire, Gloucestershire and Worcestershire. There are two halls, the larger of which includes stage facilities, as well as a bar and refreshment area.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £54,436
Total expenditure: £47,620

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Gloucestershire
  • Oxfordshire
  • Warwickshire
  • Worcestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 31 December 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JENNY GLOVER Chair 10 March 2006
None on record
Justine Michaela Taylor Trustee 12 May 2020
None on record
Clifford Faulkner Trustee 01 January 2020
TOWNSEND HALL
Recently registered
BANBURY METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Mark Beaumont Trustee 03 January 2015
TOWNSEND HALL
Recently registered
PETER LUMLEY JOHNSON Trustee 04 March 2010
None on record
DAVID SQUIRES Trustee 03 March 2005
TOWNSEND HALL
Recently registered
DRUG ACTION SHIPSTON
Charity reporting is overdue by 38 days
RICHARD SALISBURY TAYLOR Trustee 01 May 1980
SHIPSTON ON STOUR AREA U3A
Received: On time
THE SHIPSTON-ON-STOUR CHARITIES
Received: On time
THE SHIPSTON ON STOUR EDUCATIONAL CHARITY
Received: On time
GEOFF RIDGWAY Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £35.11k £55.30k £50.61k £57.41k £54.44k
Total expenditure £42.04k £23.79k £54.48k £39.26k £47.62k
Income from government contracts £1.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.00k £40.50k £17.76k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 12 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024

(These accounts
have been qualified)

12 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 29 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 29 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 08 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 08 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 17 February 2022 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 17 February 2022 17 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 19 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 19 December 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 6 APRIL 1956
Charitable objects
INCOME TO BE APPLIED IN OR TOWARDS THE REPAIR AND MAINTENANCE OF THE BUILDINGS FOR THE TIME BEING BELONGING TO THE CHARITY KNOWN AS THE TOWNSEND HALL.
Area of benefit
SHIPSTON ON STOUR AND DISTRICT
Registration history
  • 31 December 1964 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
Townsend Hall
52 Sheep Street
SHIPSTON-ON-STOUR
Warwickshire
CV36 4AE
Phone:
07514704057