Financial history KNOWLE VILLAGE HALL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 523004
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £31.31k £21.92k £10.91k £22.68k £24.51k
Total expenditure £20.69k £35.22k £10.53k £19.42k £22.95k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £8.20k £15.85k N/A N/A N/A