ALBANY CENTRE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Arts and training centre. Space for events and regular classes. Act creation space.
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Bristol City
Governance
- 10 January 2024: CIO registration
- 21 February 2024: Funds received from 299957 ALBANY CENTRE
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gwendolyn Mona Hales | Chair | 07 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Pascal Haering | Trustee | 18 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emily Ruth Ball | Trustee | 20 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Collett | Trustee | 20 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
JACQUELINE ALICE CROSHER | Trustee | 07 October 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 10 Jan 2024
Charitable objects
(I) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF INNER CITY BRISTOL AND IN PARTICULAR THE POSTAL AREAS BS1, BS2, BS6 AND BS7 AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATION WITH THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTS OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. (II) TO PROMOTE,MAINTAIN,IMPROVE AND ADVANCE EDUCATION PARTICULARLY BY THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE ARTS INCLUDING THE ARTS OF DRAMA, DANCE, MUSIC, SINGING, LITERATURE, SCULPTURE AND PAINTING.(III) TO ESTABLISH OR TO SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE THEREINAFTER CALLED "THE CENTRE" AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE, OR TO COOPERATE WITH ANY LOCAL STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTEINANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE ASSOCIATION AND ITS CONSTITUENT BODIES IN FURTHERENCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE ALBANY CENTRE
SHAFTESBURY AVENUE
BRISTOL
BS6 5LT
BS6 5LT
- Phone:
- 01173305038
- Email:
- info@albanycentre.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.