QING LIANG BUDDHIST ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Qing Liang Buddhist Association organises regular weekend activities, including guided meditation, sutra reading, and lectures on Buddhist doctrine, history, and arts. Additionally, on special Buddhist occasions such as Buddha's birthday, we conduct ritual ceremonies to celebrate. All our activities are held at 111 Consort Road, London SE15 3RU.
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 13 November 2023: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GUANG KUAN | Chair | 29 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Ningna Jiang | Trustee | 08 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alain Jean Henri Dubois | Trustee | 15 November 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 10 SEP 2023
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER THE TEACHINGS AND PRACTICES OF MAHAYANA BUDDHISM, BOTH IN THE UK, BY MAKING BUDDHISM ACCESSIBLE AND AVAILABLE TO ANYONE WHO IS INTERESTED. IN FURTHERANCE OF THIS OBJECT, ACTIVITIES WILL INCLUDE: COMMUNITY SERVICES, SCHOLARLY RESEARCH, GUIDED MEDITATIONS, BUDDHIST EDUCATIONAL COURSES, TO FOSTER PEACE, HARMONY, AND A HEALTHY, BALANCED LIFESTYLE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE LOCAL AND WIDER COMMUNITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
111 CONSORT ROAD
LONDON
SE15 3RU
- Phone:
- 02074506320
- Website:
-
qingliangbuddhistcentre.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.