Financial history SUTTON COLDFIELD UNIT 42 OF THE SEA CADET CORPS

Charity number: 523023
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £59.67k £27.15k £43.04k £49.62k £148.91k
Total expenditure £55.82k £29.79k £35.26k £45.22k £158.03k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £14.00k £14.00k £14.00k £14.00k £50.00k