VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 523026
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provides facilities for local residents including fund raising events etc.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £12,930
Total expenditure: £17,235

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Warwickshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 October 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • THE VILLAGE HALL AND MUNTZ RECREATIONAL TRUST JOINT COMMITTEES (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Terence Bridgewater Trustee 11 April 2022
THE MUNTZ HALL AND RECREATION GROUND
Received: On time
Oliver Muntz Trustee 06 April 2022
THE MUNTZ HALL AND RECREATION GROUND
Received: On time
THE MUNTZ TRUST
Received: On time
Richard Page Trustee 06 April 2022
THE MUNTZ HALL AND RECREATION GROUND
Received: On time
Penelope Meakin Trustee 06 April 2022
THE MUNTZ HALL AND RECREATION GROUND
Received: On time
Anthony Ronal Dixon Trustee 27 March 2018
THE MUNTZ HALL AND RECREATION GROUND
Received: On time
Leila Chaudry Trustee 25 March 2014
THE MUNTZ HALL AND RECREATION GROUND
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £15.65k £14.13k £3.07k £8.86k £12.93k
Total expenditure £17.53k £8.46k £7.66k £9.74k £17.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 31 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 01 November 2021 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 28 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Radway
Bates Lane
Tanworth-in-Arden
Solihull
B94 5AS
Phone:
07738879193