Financial history WELLESBOURNE VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 523034
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018
Total gross income £12.38k £22.38k £13.77k £17.25k £19.25k
Total expenditure £11.83k £69.33k £10.55k £9.63k £29.88k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 £3.00k £3.00k