WOMBOURNE CRICKET, TENNIS & BOWLING CLUB

Charity number: 1206678
Recently registered

Charity overview

This charity has been recently registered - it does not need to update its information until 10 months after its first financial period ends

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Promoting community participation in healthy recreation benefiting the inhabitants of Wombourne by the provision of facilities for the playing of cricket, tennis, bowling and other sports at an amateur level. Incorporating the provision of coaching and development opportunities across all ages, social standing and ability and promoting physical health and fitness for all.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
No information available
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Dudley
  • Staffordshire
  • Wolverhampton

Governance

Registration history:
  • 23 January 2024: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Edward John Boyle Chair 27 November 2019
None on record
Neil Martin Trustee 04 December 2023
None on record
Andrea Powell Trustee 04 December 2023
None on record
Robert Gorton Trustee 30 November 2022
None on record
Paul Andrew Church Trustee 30 November 2022
None on record
Adrian Jeavons Trustee 30 November 2022
None on record
Peter James Western Trustee 07 December 2021
None on record
Adam James Bradley Trustee 07 December 2021
None on record
Stephen Scott Trustee 27 November 2019
None on record

Financial history

This charity was registered recently. It does not have to provide information until 10 months after its first financial period.

Accounts and annual returns

This is a newly registered charity - accounts and annual return not required yet. The charity does not need to update its information until 10 months after its first financial period ends.

Governing document

Contact information

Address:
WOMBOURNE CRICKET TENNIS & BOWLING
CHURCH ROAD
WOMBOURNE
WOLVERHAMPTON
STAFFORDSHIRE
WV5 9EZ
Phone:
01902895199
Website:

No information available