DESMOID AID UK
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Desmoid Aid UK is a non-profit charity providing information for patients and their families when they have been diagnosed with Desmoid-type fibromatosis. The charity provides links to information and resources about the disease. We also provide a small grant to help pay for unexpected costs for newly diagnosed patients undergoing treatment.
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 05 March 2024: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jacqui Black | Chair | 23 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julie Langley | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anna Worthington | Trustee | 21 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sam Hackett | Trustee | 18 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Sloman | Trustee | 16 February 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 05 Mar 2024
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE CHARITABLE NEEDS OF PEOPLE DIAGNOSED WITH DESMOID-TYPE FIBROMATOSIS (ALSO KNOWN AS AGGRESSIVE FIBROMATOSIS AND DESMOID TUMOURS) AND THOSE WHO CARE FOR THEM FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE PROVISION OF: A. FINANCIAL GRANTS TO PEOPLE DIAGNOSED WITH DESMOID-TYPE FIBROMATOSIS; B. EDUCATION AND INFORMATION TO RAISE PUBLIC AWARENESS AND PROMOTE THE EFFECTIVE CARE OF PEOPLE AFFECTED BY DESMOID TUMOURS; C. ANY OTHER ADDITIONAL SUPPORT TO PEOPLE AFFECTED BY DESMOID TUMOURS AND RELATED CONDITIONS AS TRUSTEES SEE FIT. THERE IS NO GEOGRAPHICAL LIMITS WITHIN ENGLAND AND WALES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
16
OCKENDEN ROAD
LITTLEHAMPTON
16
OCKENDEN ROAD
BN17 7FH
- Phone:
- 07974005676
- Email:
- info@desmoidaiduk.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.