WARWICKSHIRE COUNTY FEDERATION OF YOUNG FARMERS CLUBS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Voluntary Rural Youth Organisaion
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

16 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 05 December 1966: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Katy Walsh | Chair | 13 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Casey McDaid | Trustee | 26 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Brad Weetman | Trustee | 26 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sam Ross | Trustee | 05 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mary Meadows | Trustee | 05 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert Wilson | Trustee | 05 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lucas Mann | Trustee | 05 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Birch | Trustee | 05 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Jeyes | Trustee | 13 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Will Rowland | Trustee | 13 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Georgia Payne | Trustee | 13 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Adam Lynch | Trustee | 13 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Martin Brandreth | Trustee | 13 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Matt Ingram | Trustee | 28 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Megan Bailey | Trustee | 03 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Robert Mitchell | Trustee | 11 November 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.05k | £11.39k | £11.01k | £56.45k | £92.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.27k | £16.41k | £15.75k | £38.74k | £76.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £4.55k | £1.83k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 25 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 25 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 26 September 2023 | 88 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 26 September 2023 | 88 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 28 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 11 December 2020 | 164 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 11 December 2020 | 164 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1937, AS AMENDED 12TH NOVEMBER 1971 as amended on 30 Aug 2022
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN AGRICULTURE, HOME CRAFTS, COUNTRY LIFE AND RELATED SUBJECTS(B) IN THE INTERESTS OF THE SOCIAL WELFARE OF SUCH MEMBERS TO PROVIDE AND PROMOTE THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATIONS, BEING FACILITIES WHICH WILL IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE AND WILL ASSIST IN THE DEVELOPMENT OF THEIR SPIRITUAL AND MENTAL CAPACTIES, SELF-RELIANCE AND INDIVIDUAL RESPONSIBILITY SO THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF THE COMMUNITY
Area of benefit
COUNTY OF WARWICK
Contact information
- Address:
-
W F Y F C
Y F C CENTRE
NATIONAL AGRICULTURAL CENTRE
STONELEIGH PARK
KENILWORTH
CV8 2LG
- Phone:
- 02467696588
- Email:
- office@warks-fyfc.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window