1ST CAERGWRLE COMPANY OF THE BOYS' BRIGADE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide activities in accordance with the national Boys Brigade organisation
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Flintshire
Governance
- 23 March 1967: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DION WILLIAMS | Chair |
|
||||||
Stephen Gould | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Gareth Jones | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
JOHN ELLIS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.98k | £14.89k | £8.42k | £19.07k | £19.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.77k | £18.48k | £18.67k | £22.00k | £24.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 23RD FEBRUARY 1967 CONVEYANCE AND TRUST DEED 22ND OCTOBER 1971.
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF CHRIST'S KINGDOM AMONGST BOYS AND THE PROMOTION OF HABITS OF OBEDIENCE, REVERENCE, DISCIPLINE, SELF RESPECT AND ALL THAT TENDS TOWARDS A TRUE CHRISTIAN MANLINESS.
Area of benefit
CAERGWRLE
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE OLD VICARAGE
VICARAGE ROAD
RHYDYMWYN
MOLD
CH7 5HL
- Phone:
- 01352742254
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window