THE CAREERS OFFICE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Careers Office links young people with employers or universities so the young persons awareness of career or educational opportunities are expanded so they are empowered to reach their full potential. The events also aids the employer/university/profession increase its diversity. The events are held at the employer's, etc premises or online.
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 09 May 2024: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Deborah Margaret Streatfield | Chair | 13 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gemma Anne Faux | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Arna van Goch | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
KEITH RAYMOND HERRMANN | Trustee | 13 July 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 13 JUL 2021 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 01 MAY 2024
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ('OBJECTS') ARE: TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE AND ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF CAREER GUIDANCE, EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AS A MEANS OF: (1) ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; (2) ADVANCING EDUCATION; (3) RELIEVING UNEMPLOYMENT. [NOTHING IN THE ARTICLES SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CHARITY FOR PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005 AND/OR SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008.].
Contact information
- Address:
-
ORIEL HOUSE
26 THE QUADRANT
RICHMOND
TW9 1DL
- Phone:
- 07974357922
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.