FRIENDS OF THE NORWOOD SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Friends of The Norwood School aims to advance the education of pupils in the school by helping to develop relationships between staff, carers and parents and by engaging in activities, providing facilities or equipment which support the school and advance the education of pupils.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Lambeth
Governance
- 23 November 2023: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrea Bigger | Chair | 16 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emma Morrison | Trustee | 16 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Brind | Trustee | 16 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ailsa Claire Wakley BA Hons | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Svetlana Kapelas | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 18 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 MAR 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE ASSOCIATION (THE OBJECTS) IS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: 2.1 DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL 2.2 ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
40 Hill House Road
LONDON
SW16 2AQ
- Phone:
- 02086709382
- Email:
- post@thenorwoodschool.org
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window