LUNESDALE HALL, KIRKBY LONSDALE

Charity Number: 523063
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Operation of Lunesdale Hall (previously Kirkby Lonsdale Institute), a public use building for the use of the residents and visitors to the town.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £41,311
Total expenditure: £47,258

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Cumbria

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 November 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • KIRKBY LONSDALE INSTITUTE (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Robin Ree Chair 04 October 2021
None on record
Patricia France Trustee 09 July 2024
None on record
Shirley Jane Boyd Trustee 09 July 2024
None on record
Paul Cassell Trustee 09 July 2024
None on record
Elizabeth Mary Saunders MA Trustee 09 July 2024
KIRKBY LONSDALE COMMUNITY CUPBOARD CIO
Recently registered

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £38.41k £41.85k £44.64k £51.75k £41.31k
Total expenditure £30.18k £78.05k £24.06k £65.32k £47.26k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £11.33k £22.36k £2.67k N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 03 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 03 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 28 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 28 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 29 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 29 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
The Lunesdale Hall
Bective Road
Kirkby Lonsdale
CARNFORTH
LA6 2BG
Phone:
01524271437
Website:

No information available