MILBURN VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROVISION OF ACCOMMODATION & FACILITIES FOR CULTURAL, EDUCATIONAL AND RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES FOR THE INHABITANTS OF MILBURN PARISH, AN ISOLATED RURAL COMMUNITY, SUCH ACTIVITIES BEING OPEN AND ADVERTISED TO THE INHABITANTS OF OUR NEIGHBOURING VILLAGES, BLENCARN, NEWBIGGIN, KNOCK AND DUFTON.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cumbria
Governance
- 16 September 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Helen Rorks | Chair | 03 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rose Heelis | Trustee | 04 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ellen Healey | Trustee | 03 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jill McCulley | Trustee | 03 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Debra Payton | Trustee | 03 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Bellsham | Trustee | 10 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Rorks | Trustee | 28 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Barry Alan Murphy Treasurer | Trustee | 11 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Aelwen Elizabeth Evans Secretary | Trustee | 14 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Evans | Trustee | 14 January 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.42k | £20.16k | £8.06k | £7.60k | £7.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.45k | £4.83k | £6.13k | £6.15k | £6.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £17.67k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 07 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 08 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 22 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 27 MAY 1963 AS AMENDED ON 08 OCT 2015
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
MILBURN AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Wisteria Cottage
Milburn
Penrith
CA10 1TW
- Phone:
- 01768361216
- Email:
- aelwenevans@googlemail.com
- Website:
-
milburnvillagehall.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window