Trustees THE MUSGRAVE PARISH INSTITUTE
Charity Number: 523071

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Janet Catherine Jenkins | Trustee | 06 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Michael Watson | Trustee | 27 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Brownrigg | Trustee | 27 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Karen Brownrigg | Trustee | 04 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Margaret Finerty | Trustee | 04 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
ANITA HANNAM | Trustee | 09 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW WELLS | Trustee | 05 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
LORRAINE PLEWS | Trustee | 05 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
DAVID EWIN | Trustee | 05 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
SANDRA WATSON | Trustee | 05 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
IAN PLEWS | Trustee | 05 December 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.