THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY, ATHERSTONE

Charity Number: 1206055
Recently registered

Charity overview

This charity has been recently registered - it does not need to update its information until 10 months after its first financial period ends

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church. Based in St Mary's Church, Atherstone we offer a place of Christian worship, generally advance the Christian religion teaching, conduct Christian based religeous services and ceremonies including baptisms, weddings and funerals. We also provide space for community events. We make grants to Christian organisations.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Warwickshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 December 2023: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • ATHERSTONE - ST. MARY (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Michael John Brandsma Chair 11 October 2017
THE CHARITY OF PRISCILLA GENT AND OTHERS
Received: On time
Keith Wise Trustee 26 March 2023
THE CHARITY OF PRISCILLA GENT AND OTHERS
Received: On time
Yvonne Zena Stone Trustee 26 March 2023
THE CHARITY OF PRISCILLA GENT AND OTHERS
Received: On time
NORTH WARWICKSHIRE MUSEUM & COMMUNITY HUB
Recently registered
Sharon May Holland Trustee 26 March 2023
THE CHARITY OF PRISCILLA GENT AND OTHERS
Received: On time
Patricia Maria Hathway Trustee 26 March 2023
None on record
SUSAN MARGARET STOCK Trustee 26 March 2023
None on record
Elizabeth Ann Wainman Trustee 03 April 2022
None on record
Elizabeth Ann Surplice Trustee 03 April 2022
None on record
Suzanne Grimstead Trustee 03 April 2022
None on record
Patricia Ann Shilton Trustee 03 April 2022
None on record
Sharon Yvonne Simkiss Trustee 20 May 2021
None on record

Financial history

This charity was registered recently. It does not have to provide information until 10 months after its first financial period.

Accounts and annual returns

This is a newly registered charity - accounts and annual return not required yet. The charity does not need to update its information until 10 months after its first financial period ends.

Governing document

Contact information

Address:
The Market Place
Sheepy Road
Atherstone
Warwickshire
UK
CV9 1EX
Phone:
01827437292