WHITBY AND ESK VALLEY ACTIVE TRAVEL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We have the declared aims of facilitating the provision of active travel infrastructure (paths, benches, storage etc), and promoting the uptake of active travel in the Whitby and Esk Valley area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2025
Total income includes £1,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 11 January 2024: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr IAN SUCKLING | Chair | 11 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ben Noble | Trustee | 11 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Jefferson | Trustee | 11 January 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2025 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2025 | 22 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2025 | 22 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 11 Jan 2024
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE AND FACILITATE, IN THE WHITBY AND ESK VALLEY AREA THE DEVELOPMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF ACCESSIBLE PATHS AND FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE INCLUDING WALKERS, CYCLISTS, EQUESTRIANS AND THOSE WITH DISABILITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
SEA LEVEL, EAST ROW
SANDSEND
WHITBY
YO21 3SU
- Phone:
- 07870263762
- Email:
- ian.suckling@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window