WITHERSLACK PARISH HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Hall is open to Witherslack and the surrounding areas. for use as meeting place, youth activities, social occasions . use by local authorities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

15 Trustee(s)
36 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cumbria
Governance
- 17 June 1971: Standard registration
- PARISH HALL (Previous name)
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LINDA PARK | Chair |
|
|
|||||||
Jacqueline Edgecombe | Trustee | 22 February 2025 |
|
|
||||||
Pauline Mort | Trustee | 22 October 2024 |
|
|||||||
Danielle Metcalfe | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Wayne Dove | Trustee | 17 May 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Anna Crowe | Trustee | 21 November 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Janet Crowe | Trustee | 21 November 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Janet Mason | Trustee | 16 May 2016 |
|
|
||||||
CAROLINE BLEA | Trustee | 24 July 2013 |
|
|
||||||
DANIEL JACKSON | Trustee | 06 September 2011 |
|
|
||||||
MRS D AINSWORTH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
MRS P HODGSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
Stephen Ratcliffe | Trustee |
|
||||||||
JANE YEOMAN | Trustee |
|
||||||||
LINDA BOWMAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.87k | £487 | £14.27k | £9.97k | £70.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.12k | £4.01k | £15.33k | £8.02k | £12.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £10.82k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 7TH JUNE 1971
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE CIVIL PARISH OF WITHERSLACK, THE CIVIL PARISH OF MEATHOP AND ULPHA AND THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WITHERSLACK WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHE FORMS OF RECREATON AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Middle Foulshaw Farm
Levens
WITHERSLACK
KENDAL
Cumbria
LA8 8ET
- Phone:
- 07786196626
- Email:
- ALANTUC7@AOL.CO.UK
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window