ABBERLEY VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
provide and maintain building and facilities for all age groups
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
Total income includes £625 from 2 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 17 August 1965: Standard registration
- SAINT GEORGE'S HALL (Previous name)
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SUSAN COLEY | Chair | 12 January 1996 |
|
|
||||
Naomi Cambray | Trustee | 21 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD GOODMAN | Trustee | 04 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
ADRIAN PARROTT | Trustee | 04 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
JULIE MILLS | Trustee | 17 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
SHEENA MURRAY | Trustee | 12 March 1996 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP OSBORNE | Trustee | 12 March 1996 |
|
|
||||
JANET OSBORNE | Trustee | 12 March 1996 |
|
|
||||
SARAH COLEY | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.79k | £38.08k | £20.23k | £23.05k | £23.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.34k | £16.28k | £17.05k | £30.65k | £31.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £600 | £28.60k | N/A | N/A | £625 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 10 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 14 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 13 March 2022 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 13 March 2022 | 13 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 21 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 9 JUNE 1965 AS VARIED BY SCHEME OF 11TH MARCH 1985
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF ABBERLEY IN THE COUNTY OF WORCESTER AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS AND IN PARTICULAR FOR USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES AND OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
ABBERLEY AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
THYME COTTAGE
THE COMMON
ABBERLEY
WORCESTER
WR6 6AY
- Phone:
- 01299896213
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window