Accounts and annual returns THE ALVECHURCH PLAYING FIELD TRUST (OTHERWISE KNOWN AS THE WIGGIN MEMORIAL PLAYING FIELD)

Charity number: 523089
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 15 April 2025 74 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 15 April 2025 440 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 08 February 2023 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 09 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 13 February 2021 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required