ALVECHURCH VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Operation of Village Hall (community building)
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

15 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 17 June 1968: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher James Davies | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Alyson Williams | Trustee | 15 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Catharine Russell | Trustee | 17 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tony Wallis | Trustee | 30 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jackie Burch | Trustee | 06 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mike Crook | Trustee | 07 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Miall | Trustee | 07 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Judith Yendell | Trustee | 28 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Evans | Trustee | 16 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
STEVE SIDDLE | Trustee | 19 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Annette English | Trustee | 06 March 2017 |
|
|||||
Janet Brice | Trustee | 02 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Riley | Trustee | 20 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
HAZEL WATKISS | Trustee | 18 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
CLARE HOWE | Trustee | 05 March 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £45.14k | £35.17k | £29.94k | £29.21k | £36.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.90k | £35.45k | £28.26k | £27.29k | £34.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.50k | £25.01k | £14.46k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 12 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 10 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 22 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 13 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 23 JANUARY 1979
Charitable objects
TO PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE BENEFICIAL AREA, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF ALVECHURCH
Contact information
- Address:
-
30 Pennyford Close
REDDITCH
B97 6TW
- Phone:
- 07977140088
- Email:
- avhtreasurer100@gmail.com
- Website:
-
alvechurchvillagehall.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window