LAFIYA NIGERIA LTD
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Lafiya Nigeria Ltd is a community-based organisation that promotes access to, and facilitates provision of contraception and family planning information to women and girls in sub-Saharan Africa.
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Nigeria
Governance
- 09 February 2024: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Khalil Mair | Chair | 06 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Olivia Iloetonma | Trustee | 25 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Osamwonyi Edwin Esosa | Trustee | 25 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Adrienne Policht | Trustee | 25 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Matthew MacGeoch | Trustee | 06 February 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 18 NOV 2021 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 08 FEB 2024
Charitable objects
THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS ("OBJECTS") ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN NIGERIA: (A)TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT GOOD HEALTH, INCLUDING, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, THE PREVENTION OF MATERNAL MORTALITY OR THE SUFFERING CAUSED BY UNINTENDED PREGNANCIES THROUGH THE PROVISION AND / OR FACILITATION OF FAMILY PLANNING SERVICES AND OTHER MEDICAL SERVICES AND TREATMENTS TO REDUCE MATERNAL MORTALITY, RELIEVE SICKNESS AND PRESERVE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF THE MOTHER AND CHILD; AND (B)TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN SUBJECTS RELATING TO SEXUAL REPRODUCTIVE HEALTH AND FAMILY PLANNING BY PROVIDING ADVICE, INFORMATION, EDUCATION, TRAINING, COUNSELLING AND ADVOCACY.
Area of benefit
IN NIGERIA
Contact information
- Address:
-
52 Old Castle Street
LONDON
E1 7AJ
- Phone:
- 07806710529
- Email:
- info@lafiyanigeria.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.