Financial history STOCK AND BRADLEY VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 523102
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £8.07k £14.02k £24.66k £21.40k £28.99k
Total expenditure £9.71k £6.09k £17.58k £17.42k £29.21k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k £18.53k £2.67k N/A