CLEVEDON LITFEST

Charity number: 1206829
Recently registered

Charity overview

This charity has been recently registered - it does not need to update its information until 10 months after its first financial period ends

Activities - how the charity spends its money

OUR PURPOSE To promote public appreciation of the arts in Clevedon and the surrounding area for the public benefit by providing an annual programme of events which will include workshops, talks, demonstrations, films, theatre, music, art, authors, books, poetry, storytelling and anything to do with the written and spoken word.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • North Somerset

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 February 2024: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • CLEVEDON LITERARY FESTIVAL (Working name)
  • CLEVEDON LITERARY FESTIVAL CIC (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Carol Susan Price Chair 13 November 2023
None on record
Christine Harrison Trustee 01 July 2024
None on record
Jeff Lightly Trustee 26 February 2024
None on record
Paul Truan Trustee 15 January 2024
None on record
Jayne Linington Trustee 13 November 2023
None on record
CATRIONA ISABEL WHITE Trustee 13 November 2023
MODERN POETRY IN TRANSLATION LIMITED
Received: On time

Financial history

This charity was registered recently. It does not have to provide information until 10 months after its first financial period.

Accounts and annual returns

This is a newly registered charity - accounts and annual return not required yet. The charity does not need to update its information until 10 months after its first financial period ends.

Governing document

Contact information

Address:
11 Ashley Road
Clevedon
BS21 7UX
Phone:
01275261070
Website:

clevedonlitfest.org.uk