ANGLICAN MISSIONARY CONGREGATIONS (AMC) MOSTON,(A.K.A AMC-IMMANUEL CHURCH MOSTON) CIO

Charity number: 1207833
Recently registered

Charity overview

This charity has been recently registered - it does not need to update its information until 10 months after its first financial period ends

Activities - how the charity spends its money

THE ADVANCEMENT OF CHRISTIAN FAITH IN UNITED KINGDOM AND WORLDWIDE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES SET OUT IN THE STATEMENT OF FAITH CONTAINED IN THE SCHEDULE.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 April 2024: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • ANGLICAN MISSIONARY CONGREGATIONS (AMC) MOSTON,(A.K.A AMC-IMMANUEL CHURCH MOSTON) CIC (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Herbert Okwelogu Chair 18 April 2019
Anglican Missionary Congregations(AMC)Headquarters(A.K.A AMC-Church of Restoration Manchester UK)
Received: On time
Grace Ojukwu URUM Trustee 22 August 2024
None on record
CEDRIC NWAFOR Trustee 08 March 2021
None on record
JUSTINA OKOYE Trustee 06 April 2020
None on record
DR CHINYERE OKWELOGU Trustee 18 April 2019
None on record

Financial history

This charity was registered recently. It does not have to provide information until 10 months after its first financial period.

Accounts and annual returns

This is a newly registered charity - accounts and annual return not required yet. The charity does not need to update its information until 10 months after its first financial period ends.

Governing document

Contact information

Address:
70 CHALFORD ROAD
MANCHESTER
M23 2SG
Phone:
07799942453
Website:

No information available