MEADS (EASTBOURNE) COMMUNITY CENTRE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We aim to takeover operations at the Parish Hall, Meads, continue to offer it for the use of all, and repair and renovate it for the 21st century.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2025
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- East Sussex
Governance
- 16 January 2024: CIO registration
No other names
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Christopher Smart MA FCA | Chair | 28 November 2023 |
|
|||||
ANDREW MATHIESON WILLIAMS | Trustee | 02 May 2025 |
|
|||||
Annalisa Bicknell | Trustee | 22 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Marie Wallace | Trustee | 28 November 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 16 Jan 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF MEADS (THE ELECTORAL WARD KNOWN AS MEADS, IN THE CONSTITUENCY OF EASTBOURNE, EAST SUSSEX) AND NEIGHBOURING COMMUNITIES, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS, CLUBS AND GROUPS, IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 48
Park Gates
Chiswick Place
EASTBOURNE
East Sussex
BN21 4BE
- Phone:
- 07803203870
- Email:
- info@meadshall.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.