UKRAINIAN HISTORY GLOBAL INITIATIVE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity will commission academic research and publish, or procure the publication of, the useful results of that research. The charity aims to facilitate excellence in research amongst invited scholars, and to generate a collective project which deepens public understanding of the history of Ukraine and its people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ukraine
Governance
- 01 December 2023: Standard registration
- UKRAINIAN HISTORY: GLOBAL INITIATIVE (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Carl Bildt | Chair | 24 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Serhiy Zhadan | Trustee | 17 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Fareed Zakaria | Trustee | 17 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Philippe Sands | Trustee | 17 January 2024 |
|
|||||
Borys Gudziak | Trustee | 17 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nataliya Gumenyuk | Trustee | 17 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Iuliia Mostova | Trustee | 17 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anne Applebaum | Trustee | 16 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Timothy Snyder | Trustee | 16 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Victor Pinchuk | Trustee | 10 October 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2024 | |
---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 02 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 10 OCT 2023
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY EXISTS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR, BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION, IN THE HUMANITIES AND SOCIAL SCIENCES AND IN RESPECT OF THE HISTORY OF UKRAINE AND THE UKRAINIAN PEOPLE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 Queen Street Place
London
EC4R 1BE
EC4R 1BE
- Phone:
- 02075517777
- Email:
- office@uhgi.org
- Website:
-
uhgi.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window