NETHER WITH UPPER POPPLETON PCC (ALL SAINTS' AND ST EVERILDA'S)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Nether with Upper Poppleton is a parish within the Diocese of York, operating through St Everildas & All Saints Churches. We serve the local ecclesiastical parish, diocese & beyond through pastoral, evangelistic, social and ecumenical activities of public worship, small group teaching, pastoral, youth & childrens work, supporting mission partners in UK & abroad an maintaining our Churches.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
Total income includes £4,450 from 2 government grant(s)
People

15 Trustee(s)
75 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- City Of York
Governance
- 09 April 2024: Standard registration
- NETHER WITH UPPER POPPLETON PCC (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev SIMON CHRISTOPHER BIDDLESTONE | Chair | 01 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Anthony David Pink | Trustee | 10 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew George Lyon Wordie | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Mairi Ellen Taylor-Gibson | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joseph Savage | Trustee | 01 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Anne Johnson | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Dr Mark Thomas Boast | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Owen Kosling | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Hetmanski | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lynda Susan Salmon | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Harold Arthur Pickup | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Moira Boast | Trustee | 01 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kate Tattershall | Trustee | 01 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ralph Anthony Evans | Trustee | 01 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
SARAH ANN CLARKE | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £106.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £86.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £4.45k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 26 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 26 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH, PASTORAL, EVANGELISTIC, SOCIAL AND ECUMENICAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Parish Office
All Saints' Hall
The Green
Upper Poppleton
York
- Phone:
- 07764226624
- Email:
- poppletonparish@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window