THIRD HERITAGE FELLOWSHIP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Education about Islam, primarily for converts and those with an active interest in the faith. Provision of training and information for community service personnel who are likely to come into contact with converts to Islam (eg, for mosque staff and volunteers, hospital and prison chaplains, etc)
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Nottingham City
Governance
- 29 February 2024: Standard registration
- MUALLIF (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Micah Davis Anderson | Chair | 11 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
MANISHA AMERA YASIN | Trustee | 24 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
YUSUF IBRAHIM LAWSON | Trustee | 15 January 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 10 NOV 2021 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03 DEC 2021 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10 FEB 2022 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16 MAY 2022 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09 JUN 2022 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24 AUG 2022 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30 NOV 2022 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21 NOV 2023
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE THE RELIGION OF ISLAM, IN PARTICULAR BY: I) RAISING AWARENESS OF AND PROVIDING EDUCATION ON ISLAM FOR ANY MEMBER OF THE PUBLIC WITH AN ACTIVE INTEREST IN THE FAITH; II) PROMOTING THE EDUCATION AND WELLBEING OF CONVERTS TO THE FAITH; III) PROVIDING EDUCATION AND TRAINING FOR COMMUNITY SERVICE PERSONNEL OFFERING SUPPORT FOR CONVERTS TO THE FAITH IN THE UK AND ELSEWHERE; AND IN SO DOING, TO PROMOTE RELIGIOUS AND RACIAL HARMONY WITHIN THE UNITED KINGDOM. (B) TO PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES THAT ARE CONSISTENT WITH THE ABOVE AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED BY THE TRUSTEES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
℅ GRIFFIN & SAGE LIMITED
172 PARK ROAD
PETERBOROUGH
PE1 2UF
- Phone:
- 07407231697
- Email:
- salih@muallif.org
- Website:
-
muallif.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.