Financial history OVERBURY VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 523174
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £20.63k £15.45k £12.96k £9.93k £11.21k
Total expenditure £13.07k £8.04k £17.24k £2.71k £4.64k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £3.36k £12.72k £8.00k N/A N/A